Lau, Justin (CPSO#: 105057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lau ( CPSO# 105057)
Dr. S. Khosla ( CPSO# 103195)

Business Address:
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 601-8621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016