Lau, Michael Chi-Kit (CPSO#: 61668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7581
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lifelabs
100 International Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael C.K. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lau ( CPSO# 61668 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7581

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHI-KIT LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1992