Lau, Peter Pui Tak (CPSO#: 68114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ground Floor Unit 3
260 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2E4
Phone: (416) 979-9988
Fax: (416) 979-8774
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter P.T. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lau ( CPSO# 68114 )

Business Address:
Ground Floor Unit 3
260 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2E4
Phone Number: (416) 979-9988

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]

            As from April 18, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Pui Tak Lau in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lau to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. PETER PUI TAK LAU
                                              ("Dr. Lau")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lau, certificate of registration number 68114, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that the College investigated a complaint bearing
                  File Number 103722 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in
                  professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"),
                        attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a review of Management of Chronic Hepatitis B: Canadian
                              Association for the Study of the Liver Consensus Guidelines; 
                  
                        (ii)  a review of the College Policy #4-12 on Medical Records;
                  
                        (iii) a review of the College Policy #1-11 on Test Results
                              Management;
                  
                        (iv)  a review of the College Practice Guide: Medical
                              Professionalism and College Policies; 
                        (v)   a review of the College of Family Physicians of Canada's
                              Guide to Enhancing Referrals and Consultations between
                              Physicians.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge and represent that I have already completed
                        the University of Toronto's (U of T) Record Keeping Course. I
                        undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful
                        completion of this course, including proof of registration and
                        attendance and participant assessment reports if applicable within
                        one (1) month;
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to provide a 2000-word written summary to the
                        College regarding the Professional Education set out above. This
                        shall include a summary of the materials reviewed and an
                        explanation as to how the Professional Education is applicable to
                        my practice, and detail any changes to my practice as a result of
                        the Professional Education. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to complete this requirement within six (6)
                        months.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice (the "Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the report may
                        form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Lau, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions 
                  of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral
                   of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lau, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Lau
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              the practice of family medicine. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Lau will engage in professional education in
                                    Medical Record-Keeping, Enhancing Referrals and
                                    Consultations between Physicians, and Test Results
                                    Management; and
                  
                                    Dr. Lau's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within six months of the end of
                                    the period of Professional Education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Lau, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Lau, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Lau, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (d)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Pui Tak Lau to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 18, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Lau engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Lau will engage in professional education in Medical Record-Keeping, Enhancing Referrals and Consultations between Physicians, and Test Results Management; and

Dr. Lau’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Professional Education