Lau, Robert (CPSO#: 57622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 & Finch Pediatrics
6620 Finch Ave West, Unit 6-7
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5H7
Phone: 647 985 4236
Fax: 416 747 9441
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sick Kids
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416 813 5859
Fax: 4168135327
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1994