Lau, Timothy Wing Chi (CPSO#: 50485)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 1995

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jul 1993
Summary:

In a Hearing which began in December 1992, Dr. Lau pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine 
that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional.    Dr. Lau also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(b) of the Health 
Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that his rights or privileges under the Narcotic Control Act (Canada) or the Food and 
Drugs Act (Canada) or the regulations under either of them had been restricted or withdrawn.    The Discipline Committee 
accepted Dr. Lau s plea of guilty to these charges, and found him guilty of professional misconduct.    Consequently, the 
Committee ordered that the following penalty be imposed: 
 
   1. Dr. Lau was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. 
 
   2. The Committee further ruled that Dr. Lau s licence to practice be revoked; however, it stipulated that the penalty of 
      revocation was to be suspended for a period of twelve months from the date of this Order, so as to allow Dr. Lau the 
      opportunity to meet the following conditions: 
  
      (i)    that he consult with the Director of the Education Department of the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
             regarding the appropriate assessment of his knowledge, skill and judgment in respect of the practice of 
             medicine; 
 
      (ii)   that as part of this assessment, Dr. Lau would be referred by the Director of the Education Department of 
             the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program; 
 
      (iii)  that Dr. Lau consent to the release by the College to the McMaster Physician Review Program of any 
             information considered appropriate by the Director of the Educational Department of the College prior to 
             the assessment taking place; 
 
      (iv)   that Dr. Lau would attend the McMaster Physician Review Program and would cooperate in every respect 
             with the assessment provided by that Program; 
 
      (v)    that Dr. Lau would consent to the release by the McMaster Physician Review Program to the College of 
             Physicians and Surgeons of any information with respect to the assessment and the result; 
 
      (vi)   that Dr. Lau would successfully complete any period of supervision and any program of upgrading which 
             might be recommended by the Physician Review Program, such as any Physician Enhancement Programs, 
             with a level 2 grade or better, failing which he would re-submit himself to any period of supervision and 
             any program of upgrading recommended by the Physician Review Program until he successfully 
             completed the Physician Review Program with a level 2 or better; 
 
      (vii)  that Dr. Lau would submit himself to such further re-assessments as might be recommended from time to 
             time by the Physician Review Program and would complete any training or upgrading recommended by 
             the Program from time to time on the occasion of any re-assessment; 
 
   (viii) that Dr. Lau would promptly pay to the College the cost of his assessment at the McMaster Physician 
          Review Program and any remediation required as and when invoiced in an amount to be prescribed by 
          the Registrar of the College, not to exceed $15,000.00; and 
               
   (ix)   that Dr. Lau was to consent to and cooperate with an inspection of his practice at his expense, on an 
          unannounced basis, on four occasions following his return to practice, and would consent to the release 
          by the inspectors of a report to the Registrar of the College on each occasion. 
              
3. The Committee also ordered that during the twelve-month period in which the penalty of revocation, set out in 
   section 2 above, was suspended, Dr. Lau's licence to practice would be restricted to work done under the guidance of 
   his remediation supervisor or his/her delegate. 
              
4. If, in the opinion of the Registrar, Dr. Lau had successfully complied with the above terms and conditions, the 
   revocation, as set out in section 2 above, and the restrictions placed on his licence, as set out in section 3 above, 
   would be vacated. 
              
5. If, however, in the judgment of the Registrar, Dr. Lau failed to comply with any of the terms and conditions set out in 
   section 2 above, the revocation referred to would commence on the earlier of the days on which the twelve-month 
   period referred to in section 2 above expired, or on a day to be fixed by the Registrar, not to exceed sixty days from the 
   date on which the default occurred. 

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 07 Dec 1992


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Feb 1992
Summary:

 In February 1992, Dr. Lau pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable 
 time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in 
 respect of an examination or treatment performed by him.  The Discipline Committee accepted this 
 plea, and found Dr. Lau guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee imposed 
 the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Lau was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. Lau was to pay a fine in the amount of $10,000.00.

3.	Dr. Lau(s 
 licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of six months.  This suspension was itself to 
 be suspended upon fulfilment of the following terms:

(a)	the required medical/legal reports were 
 to be provided to the lawyers with copies to the Registrar; the Registrar was to determine if 
 these reports were satisfactory for the suspension of Dr. Lau(s penalty of suspension; 
 and

(b)	Dr. Lau was to pay the fine cited in section 2 above.

4.	Failure to provide these 
 reports and payment of the fine within thirty days of the date upon which this Order became final 
 would result in the suspension of Dr. Lau(s licence for a period of six months.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 17 Feb 1992