Lau, Wendy Wai-Che (CPSO#: 57504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatric Laboratory
Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5440
Fax: (416) 813-5433
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canadian Blood Services
Central Ontario Region
67 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 313-4433
Fax: (416) 974-9757
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY WAI-CHE LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1989