Lau, Yat Poh (CPSO#: 17284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1373 Hazelton Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7P 4V2
Phone: (905) 335-9490
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAT POH LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1959
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1967