Laudanski, Gerald John (CPSO#: 54099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beaverton Thorah Medical Centre
468 Main Street East
Beaverton ON  L0K 1A0
Phone: (705) 426-7332
Fax: (705) 426-9661
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Don Valley Medical Centre
855 Broadview Avenue
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M4K 3Z1
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-6383
Fax: (416) 461-5985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laudanski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Laudanski ( CPSO# 54099 )

Business Address:
Beaverton Thorah Medical Centre
468 Main Street East
Beaverton ON  L0K 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 426-4332

Business Address:
302 - 855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3Z1
Phone Number: (416) 461-6383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 9, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gerald John
            Laudanski, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Laudanski
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. GERALD JOHN LAUDANSKI
                                          ("Dr. Laudanski")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Laudanski, certificate of registration number 54099, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 99279 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in
                  professional misconduct and/or am imcompetent.

            (4)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that, after the College receives an
                  original copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no further action will
                  be taken on the Investigation. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least six (6) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts every two
                              weeks for the first month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts every two
                              weeks for the next three months;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts every month
                              for the next two months;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss and review the charts and prescriptions for every
                              patient to whom I have initiated a new prescriptions for a
                              narcotic drug, narcotic preparation, controlled drug,
                              benzodiazepine or other targets substance, and/or all other
                              monitored drug since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review
                              to ensure that assessment, clinical examination risk
                              assessment for addiction and on-going management and follow
                              up is appropriate;
                  
                        (v)   Additionally, the Clinical Supervisor will review five (5) of
                              my patient charts pertaining to the management of diabetic
                              patients monthly for six (6) months;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss with me any concerns arising from such chart reviews;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the dated I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto program in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all
                              three webinars and the workshop);
                        (ii)  University of Toronto Medial Record-Keeping Course;
                        (iii) review and written summary of the Diabetes Canada Clinical
                              Practice Guidelines, which can be found using the following
                              link:
                              http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/app_themes/cdacpg/resources/cpg_2013_full_en.pdf;
                              and  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to complete this requirement by within
                        six (6) months of the date of this Undertaking or, if no
                        satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first
                        possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (6) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Laudanski, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laudanski, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laudanski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laudanski, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Laudanski engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Laudanski will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six
                                    (6) months. 
                              *     Dr. Laudanski will engage in professional education in: 
                                    (i)   University of Toronto program in Safe Opioid
                                          Prescribing (all three webinars and the
                                          workshop);
                                    (ii)  University of Toronto Medial Record-Keeping
                                          Course; and
                                    (iii) Review and written summary of the Diabetes Canada
                                          Clinical Practice Guidelines, which can be found
                                          at
                                          http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/app_themes/cdacpg/resources/cpg_2013_full_en.pdf
                              *     Dr. Laudanski's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within six (6) months
                                    of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Laudanski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Laudanski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Laudanski, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerald John Laudanski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 9, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Laudanski engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in. As a result of the investigation:

-Dr. Laudanski will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months.

-Dr. Laudanski will engage in professional education in:
(i) University of Toronto program in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and the workshop);
(ii) University of Toronto Medial Record-Keeping Course; and
(iii) Review and written summary of the Diabetes Canada Clinical Practice Guidelines, which can be found at http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/app_themes/cdacpg/resources/cpg_2013_full_en.pdf

-Dr. Laudanski’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.