Lauer, Craig Hubert (CPSO#: 68524)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2036 Mahre Drive Park City UT 84098 USA
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Hampshire
USA - Utah
USA - Vermont
USA - Wyoming

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017