Laughlin, Suzanne (CPSO#: 63908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6033
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE LAUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992