Laughton, Angela Faith (CPSO#: 86345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Box 230, General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 1L6
Phone: 6137378222
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital
Box 230, General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 1L6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Laughton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Laughton ( CPSO# 86345 )

Business Address:
25 Tapiola Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1T 2J7

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 760-3700

Business Address:
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA FAITH LAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAUGHTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009