Laukkanen, Ethan (CPSO#: 43631)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2012