Laureyns, Griet Christiane Rosa (CPSO#: 88055)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 10 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009