Laurie, Scott Andrew (CPSO#: 67964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Irving Greenberg Family Cancer Cent
3045 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70175
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fitt ( CPSO# 67975 )
Dr. S. Laurie ( CPSO# 67964 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Business Address:
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6322

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 1C4
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT ANDREW LAURIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAURIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1999