Laurier, Lisanne Gabrielle (CPSO#: 54136)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 May 2007