Laurin, Michel (CPSO#: 58612)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Laurin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012