Lautenschlaeger, Erika Hedwig (CPSO#: 52242)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Medical Academy of Erfurt, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2005