Lavallee, Chad Michael (CPSO#: 70023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6455
Fax: (519) 749-6513
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

True North Imaging
751 Victoria St. S.
Suite B2
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-2636 Ext. 310
Fax: (519) 742-9717
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chad Lavallee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lavallee ( CPSO# 70023 )

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Radiology
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6455

Business Address:
200 - 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 570-2198

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAD MICHAEL LAVALLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVALLEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001