Lavallee, Luke Thomas (CPSO#: 88978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Urology
501 Smyth Road Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73019
Fax: 613-739-6842
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Nicole Flanagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017


Corporation Name: Luke Thomas Lavallee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Flanagan ( CPSO# 88891 )
Dr. L. Lavallee ( CPSO# 88978 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Urology
501 Smyth Road Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE THOMAS LAVALLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVALLEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 06 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013