Laveneziana, Pierantonio (CPSO#: 85823)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Rome, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 23 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 07 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008