Lavigne, Andrew David (CPSO#: 92818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite 105
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 705-726-7427
Fax: 705-725-7313
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lavigne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92818 )
Dr. M. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92846 )

Business Address:
Quinn Rehab Services
505 - 34 Cedar Pointe Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 5R7
Phone Number: (705) 726-2362

Business Address:
Unit 105
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-7427

Business Address:
1 Georgian Drive
Room J106A
Barrie ON  L4M 3X9

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015