Lavigne, Marnie Lynn (CPSO#: 92846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: Smith, Marnie Lynn (used until: 15 Jul 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinn Rehab Services
34 Cedar Pointe Drive
Unit 505
Barrie ON  L4N 5R7
Phone: 705-726-2362
Fax: 705-726-1589
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian College Student Life Ctr
Room J106A
1 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 3X9
Canada
Phone: 705-728-1968 Ext. 1301
Fax: 705-252-4513
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
c/o Rotary Place - 3rd Floor
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-3333
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lavigne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92818 )
Dr. M. Lavigne ( CPSO# 92846 )

Business Address:
1 Georgian Drive
Room J106A
Barrie ON  L4M 3X9

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Business Address:
Quinn Rehab Services
505 - 34 Cedar Pointe Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 5R7
Phone Number: (705) 726-2362

Business Address:
Unit 105
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-7427

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARNIE LYNN LAVIGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIGNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013