Lavine, Elana Susan (CPSO#: 77952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
8333 Weston Road
Vaughan ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Fax: (905) 850-5607
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pediatric Outpatient Consult Clinic
4th Floor
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242 1000 Ext. 21400
Fax: (416) 242 1095
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elana Lavine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lavine ( CPSO# 77952 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3273

Business Address:
310 - 8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-3250

Business Address:
Pediatric Outpatient Consult Clinic
4th Floor
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 13 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELANA SUSAN LAVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2008