Laviolette, Eric Leopold (CPSO#: 72100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital General Hawkesbury
1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Ext. 188
Fax: (613) 636-6171
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Laviolette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Laviolette ( CPSO# 72100 )

Business Address:
Hopital General Hawkesbury
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Feb 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 2, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eric Leopold
            Laviolette, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Laviolette to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                                ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                       of
                  
                                    DR. ERIC LEOPOLD LAVIOLETTE
                                                ("Dr. Laviolette")
                  
                                                       to
                  
                              COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Laviolette, certificate of registration number 72100, am a member
                  of the College. The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that the College initiated a reassessment
                  of my practice bearing File Number 03395859 (the "Reassessment") pursuant
                  to the decision and reasons of the ICR Committee, dated February 5, 2014.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:

                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, for an initial meeting to discuss
                              practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, no less than once every month for
                              the first two (2) months, and once every two months for the
                              next four (4) months;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting; 
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations  to  me for practice improvements  and
                              ongoing professional  development  and  inquire  into  my
                              compliance  with  the recommendations;
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision;
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice; and
                  
                        (viii)Maintain a log of all patient charts reviewed along with
                              patient identifiers.
                  
                   (c)  I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        assessor dated April 17th, 2017 and June 27th, 2017, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.

                  (g)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard. I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Laviolette, undertake that, following the decision
                        referenced in section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has
                        determined are reasonable.

                  (f)   I, Dr. Laviolette, hereby consent to the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code:
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s)  which  the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Laviolette, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College assessment was conducted into Dr. Laviolette's
                              documentation and standard of practice. As a result of the
                              assessment:
                  
                                    Dr.  Laviolette  will  practise  under  the  guidance
                                    of  a  Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                                    for 6 months.
                  
                                    Dr. Laviolette's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Laviolette, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice;and
                  
                  (c)   any  information  arising  from  the  monitoring  of  my
                        compliance  with  this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Laviolette, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Laviolette, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant  to  the  provisions  of the  Clinical  Supervisor's
                        undertaking set  out  at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking; 
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eric Leopold Laviolette to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2, 2017:

A College assessment was conducted into Dr. Laviolette’s documentation
and standard of practice. As a result of the assessment:

Dr. Laviolette will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Laviolette’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.