Law, Calvin How Lim (CPSO#: 68113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
The Edmond Odette Cancer Centre
Suite T2-025
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4825
Fax: (416) 480-5804
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CALVIN HOW LIM LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999