Law, James Russell (CPSO#: 66600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Claire Stewart Medical Clinic
525 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone: (519) 323-0255 Ext. 5012
Fax: (519) 323-2113
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES RUSSELL LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995