Law, Peter James (CPSO#: 21409)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 06 Jan 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1991