Law, Tamryn Keelara (CPSO#: 98327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
New East Wing, 5th Floor
Room 470
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416)603-5815
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.K. Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Law ( CPSO# 98327 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
New East Wing, 5th Floor
Room 470
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 577-5716

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMRYN KEELARA LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016