Law, Warren Cameron (CPSO#: 30570)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Warren C. Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 17 2007


Corporation Name: Warren C. Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012