Law, Yuk Ming (CPSO#: 68504)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univ of California, Los Angeles, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 01 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 1996