Lawand, Samih Ramadan (CPSO#: 60304)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Aleppo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1995