Lawendy, Abdel-Rahman (CPSO#: 79659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
Room E1-325
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58218
Fax: (519) 685-8267
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Lawendy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lawendy ( CPSO# 79659 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Center
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite E1-325
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDEL-RAHMAN LAWENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWENDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008