Lawler, Margaret Jean (CPSO#: 53988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Massachusetts
UMassMemorial HealthCare
Department of Psychiatry
55 Lake Avenue North
Worcester MA  01655
United States
Phone: (508)856-6780

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET JEAN LAWLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1985