Lawler, Michelle Christine (CPSO#: 70662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Carleton Medical Center
119 Langstaff Drive
P O Box 218
Carp ON  K0A 1L0
Phone: (613) 839-3271
Fax: (613) 839-3273
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE CHRISTINE LAWLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996