Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lawlis, Catherine Maria (CPSO#: 68904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-8966
Fax: (905) 853-2953
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine M. Lawlis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lawlis ( CPSO# 68904 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 853-8966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Feb 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARIA LAWLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1999