Lawrence, Janet Alison (CPSO#: 58219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4045
Fax: 905-813-3042
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ALISON LAWRENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWRENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988