Lawrence, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Names: Muirhead, Sarah Elizabeth (used until: 12 Jan 2003 )     Lawrence, Sarah Elizabeth (used until: 09 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road, Room 5109A
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2434
Fax: (613) 738-4215
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Lawrence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lawrence ( CPSO# 58793 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
5109A
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH LAWRENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWRENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1992