Lawrence, Sarah Linda (CPSO#: 73434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2415
Fax: (613) 738-4847
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4418
Fax: (613) 761-5385
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

P.O. Box 10007
Canoe Lake, Algonquin Park
Huntsville ON  P1H 2H2
Canada
Phone: 705 633 5573
Fax: 705 633 5574
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8561
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah L. Lawrence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lawrence ( CPSO# 73434 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH LINDA LAWRENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWRENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003