Lawrence-Black, Tracy Lynn (CPSO#: 59382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: Lawrence, Tracy Lynn (used until: 05 May 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Blythedale Children's Hospital
95 Bradhurst Avenue
Valhalla NY  10595-1637
United States
Phone: 914 831 2562
Fax: 914 592 0712

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Illinois
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY LYNN LAWRENCE-BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWRENCE-BLACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Apr 1995
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2001