Laws, Margaret-Anne (CPSO#: 63673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smiths Falls District
Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500 Ext. 4320
Fax: (613) 267-1172
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Cornelia St.
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret-Anne Laws Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Laws ( CPSO# 63673 )

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET-ANNE LAWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 31 May 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992