Lawson, Andrea Lea (CPSO#: 73579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
A2 - 150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA LEA LAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 06 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001