Lawson, Fiona Margaret Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70781)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998