Lawson, Philip Hugh Irving (CPSO#: 66445)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Apr 2006


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Nov 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 2006