Lawton, Louis Joseph (CPSO#: 33234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2676
Fax: (613) 738-4840
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Children's Treatment Center
385 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-0871
Fax: (613) 737-0871
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lawton ( CPSO# 33234 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS JOSEPH LAWTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1986