Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lax, Steven Allen (CPSO#: 51130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
227 Algonquin Boulevard
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone: (705) 264-8840
Fax: (705) 267-4181
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anson General Hospital
58 Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Allen Lax Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lax ( CPSO# 51130 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
227 Algonquin Boulevard West
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone Number: (705) 264-8840

Business Address:
Suite 203
227 Algonquin Boulevard West
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone Number: (705) 268-3858

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ALLEN LAX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1983

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)