Lax, Stuart Allen (CPSO#: 83609)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2005