Lazar, Matthew Howard (CPSO#: 57021)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 1999