Lazar, Neil Marshall (CPSO#: 31973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 PMB Suite 125
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3438
Fax: (416) 340-3359
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Lazar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lazar ( CPSO# 31973 )

Business Address:
11-PMB 125
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3438

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL MARSHALL LAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985