Lazare, Samuel Julian (CPSO#: 53678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Lazarovitz, Samuel Julian (used until: 06 Feb 1984 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 270-0415
Fax: (905) 848-1500
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL JULIAN LAZARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZARE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1999
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 1999
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 03 Dec 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Feb 1999
Summary:

 In February 1999, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lazare guilty of professional misconduct with 
 regard to engaging in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

The Committee orders that:

1)	Dr. Lazare be reprimanded and that the reprimand 
 be recorded on the Register;
2)	Dr. Lazare(s certificate of registration be suspended to commence 
 on September 1, 1999, for a period of six months; three months of which will be suspended if Dr. 
 Lazare fulfills the following conditions:

(a)	that he not engage in hour long psychotherapy or 
 counselling with patients until Dr. Schoener, in consultation with Dr. Lazare(s treating 
 therapist, satisfied the Registrar that it is appropriate for Dr. Lazare to resume hour long 
 psychotherapy or counselling, and only then under such conditions, if any, which may be 
 recommended by Dr. Schoener and accepted by the Registrar at that time;

(b)	that Dr. Lazare 
 continue to receive counselling by a counsellor acceptable to the Registrar; and,

(c)	that the 
 counsellor inform the Registrar when counselling has ended.

3.	In the event that the Registrar is 
 notified of a breach of any of the above conditions, the certificate of registration shall be 
 suspended for the balance of the six month term.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 15, 1999