Lazo Langner, Alejandro (CPSO#: 81857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Division of Hematology
800 Commissioners Road East
Rm E6 216 PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58833
Fax: (519) 685-8294
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Mexico

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 29 Oct 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alejandro Lazo Langner may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of Medicine,
                        Division  of Haematology, University of Western Ontario,  in  which
                        Dr. Lazo Langner  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            .